Mastering Speed Mathematics and Mental Maths Tricks
0.0 (0 ratings)
Instead of using a simple lifetime average, Udemy calculates a course's star rating by considering a number of different factors such as the number of ratings, the age of ratings, and the likelihood of fraudulent ratings.
3 students enrolled
Wishlisted Wishlist

Please confirm that you want to add Mastering Speed Mathematics and Mental Maths Tricks to your Wishlist.

Add to Wishlist

Mastering Speed Mathematics and Mental Maths Tricks

Improve Your Mathematical Skills By Learning Speed Mathematics Methods And Calculate Faster
0.0 (0 ratings)
Instead of using a simple lifetime average, Udemy calculates a course's star rating by considering a number of different factors such as the number of ratings, the age of ratings, and the likelihood of fraudulent ratings.
3 students enrolled
Created by Monu Sharma
Last updated 7/2016
English
Current price: $10 Original price: $100 Discount: 90% off
5 hours left at this price!
30-Day Money-Back Guarantee
Includes:
  • 43 mins on-demand video
  • 7 Articles
  • Full lifetime access
  • Access on mobile and TV
  • Certificate of Completion
What Will I Learn?
  • WITH THIS COURSE YOU WILL BE ABLE TO CALCULATE PROBLEMS MENTALLY WITHOUT THE HELP OF CALCULATOR
  • CRACK EXAMS LIKE GMAT, GRE, CAT.
View Curriculum
Requirements
  • NOTE BOOK AND PEN
Description

Learn tricks and techniques which will help you  mentally multiply numbers at lightening speed.calculate squares and addition at a lightening speed 

What will I learn?

  • to calculate many times faster than before, as well in your mind as on paper
  • Perform mental multiplication confidently, correctly and exponentially faster
  • Train you brain to think faster and better.
  • After completing this course you can calculate multiplication, squares, and addition easily
  • You will be able to complete Quantitative Aptitude part of any exam with less time.

  • Why should YOU take this course?

    1. The Speed  Mathematics techniques discussed in this course will make calculation  40 times faster than conventional methods. 

    You will have lifetime access to 15+ video lectures and all your queries/doubts will get a detail answer,

    Who is this for?

    • Everyone who wants to become faster in calculating.
    • Everyone who wants to improve maths skills 
    • Students from grade 4 onwards
    • Competitive Entrance Test Aspirants
    • Individuals wishing to broaden their Maths knowledge
    • Teacher who want to teach their students methods that will increase the interest in mathematics.
    Who is the target audience?
    • THIS COURSE IS FOR STUDENTS FROM 8-18 YRS OLD. FOR CAT,ENTRAM EXAM STUDENTS.
    Students Who Viewed This Course Also Viewed
    Curriculum For This Course
    +
    Welcome to Speed Mathematics and Mental Maths Tricks Program
    11 Lectures 25:02

    Practice Sums

     

    Multiplication by 11 – 2 digit number 

    13 x 11   18 x 11          19 x 11         24 x 11     28 x 11  

       33x 11  42x 11    49x 11     55x 11      58 x 11    11x 11

       37x 11   51x 11      77x11   81x 11      13x11      74x11 

       81x 11  85x11       92x11       911x11     39x11     79x11       88x11     23x11


    Multiplication by  – 3 digit numbers:

     194x 11     101x 11     136x 11   219x 11    225 x 11      

     

    436x 11      339 x 11    349 x 6   388 x 11   419 x 11

     

    429 x 11     459 x 11    919 x 11    926 x 11   943 x 11

     

    667  x 11    101 x 11     909 x 11   619 x 11    688 x 11

     

    515 x 11      541 x 11    584 x 11   342 x 11    445 x 11

     --------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------

    Multiplication by 12 – 2 digit number

     13 x 12  16 x 12  25 x 12  28 x 12   31 x 12

     

    36 x 12     43 x 12     48 x 12     54 x 12   58 x 12

     

     

    64 x 12        68  x  12   74 x 12  71 x 12    89 x 12

     

     

    94 x 12       91 x 12       98 x 12     88 x 12     86 x 12


    --------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------

    Multiplication by 12 – 3digit numbers:

     

    154 x 12     101  x 12     136 x 12   215 x 12    227 x 12 

     

    312 x 12      335 x 12    345 x 12   388 x 12   415 x 12

     

    425 x 12     475 x 12    515 x 12    526 x 12   543 x 12

     

    611  x 12    101 x 12     505 x 12   615 x 12    688 x 12

     

    717 x 12      741 x 12    784 x 12   342 x 12    447 x 12




    Preview 09:03

    Multiply by 21 – 2 digits

     

     

    11 x 21     19x21    28 x 21   63x 21   16 x 21

     

    69x 21   35 x 21     38 x21    85 x 21   42 x 21

     

    19x 21    23x  21    33 x 21    49 x 21   65 x 21

     

    921 x 21    56x 21   62 x 21    121 x 21    88 x 21

    MULTIPLYING 2 DIGIT NUMBERS BY 21
    01:21

    Practice sums

     Multiply by 21 – 3 digits

     

     

    114 x 21     119x21    228 x 21   463x 21   616 x 21

     

    169 x 21   357 x 21     138 x 21    785 x 21   342 x 21

     

    149 x 21    223 x  21    533 x 21    749 x 21   465 x 21


     921 x 21    576 x 21   625 x 21    121 x 21    488 x 21

    MULTIPLYING 3 DIGIT NUMBERS BY 21
    01:33

    Practice sums

     Multiply by 31 – 2 digits

     

     

    14 x 31     19x31    28 x 31   46x 31      66 x 31

     

    69x 31     57 x 31     38 x31    85 x 31   42 x 31

     

    49x 31    23x  31    53 x 31      79 x 31   65 x 31

     

    31 x 31    76x 31    65 x 31    12 x 31    88 x 31

    MULTIPLYING 2 DIGIT NUMBERS BY 31
    01:19

    Practice sums

     Multiply by 31 – 3 digits

     

     

    124 x 31     319x31    728 x 31   146x 31     266 x 31

     

    693 x 31     576 x 31     387 x31       385 x 31       425 x 31

     

    497x 31    283x  31    534 x 31       479 x 31         651 x 31

     

    314 x 31    756x 31    645 x 31       112 x 31         887 x 31

    MULTIPLYING 3 DIGIT NUMBERS BY 31
    01:24

    SQUARING of numbers ending ,beginning in 5
    02:40

    SQUARING OF 2 DIGIT NUMBERS
    01:59

    SIMPLE DIVISION
    01:45

    SIMPLE ADDITION - 2 DIGITS
    01:45

    SQUARING OF 2 NUMBERS ENDING IN 2
    01:36
    +
    SQUARING SPECIAL NUMBERS
    9 Lectures 28:51
    Squaring 2 digit numbers ending in 4
    00:35

    Squaring numbers made up of ones
    00:24

    Squaring numbers made up of threes
    00:44

    Squaring special numbers (3’s and final 2)
    00:41

    Squaring special numbers (3’s and final 4)
    00:30

    Squaring special numbers (3’s and final 5)
    00:35

    practice sums :

    Multiplication by 6 – 2 digit numbers

     

    13x6  21x6  36x 6   41 x 6    54 x 6

     

    16x 6   25x 6  39x 6  48x 6   56x 6

     

    11x 6   28 x 6   31x 6  44x 6   59x 6

     

    66 x6   89x 6   94x 6   65x 6      86x 6 

     

    Multiplication by 6 – 3 digit numbers

     

    113x 6   125x6  138x6    141x6   150x6   189x6

     

    212x6    231x 6   204x 6   260x6   294x6   315x6

     

    365x6     415x6   432x6   515 x6    541x 6   586x 6


      804 x  6    835 x  6


    Multiplication by 7 – 2 digit numbers

     

    13x 7  21x7  37x 7   41 x7    54 x 7

     

    17x 7   25x 7  39x 7  47x 7   57x 7

     

    11x 7   27 x 7   31x 7  44x 7   59x 7

     

    77 x7   79x 7   94x 7   75x 7      77x 7  


    Multiplication by 7 – 3 digit numbers

     

    113x 7   125x7  137x7    141x7   150x7   179x7

     

    212x7    231x 7   204x 7   270x7   294x7   315x7

     

    375x7     415x7   432x7   515 x7    541x 7   577x 7

     

    704 x 7    735 x 7


     


    MULTIPLYING 2.3 DIGIT NUMBERS BY 6,7
    09:34

    practice sums : 


    squaring of 2 numbers: 

    24        44     36    48   85   91   37   66  

    14     15      27     85     62    57    63  88


    squaring of 3 numbers 


    125   245   375   384  462   588  675

    148  851  759  963  421  554  951



    Preview 08:41

    Multiplying 2 digit numbers by 22 to 29
    07:05
    About the Instructor
    Monu Sharma
    0.0 Average rating
    0 Reviews
    3 Students
    1 Course
    teacher

    I am a teacher.I love teaching. I teach speed maths,concentration techniques,memory techniques, how to pass exams. I have been  teaching speed maths for the past 10 years.

    I am also a passionate instructor, that's why I started teaching on udemy to develop everyones knowledge in mathematics!

    I'm looking forward to seeing you in my course. I will continuously add new lectures, feel free to contact me about any topic you want to learn so I can create the kind of video lectures you want to learn.